Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Study on the Future of Nuclear Energy in Maryland
Sponsored by
Delegates M. Fisher, Adams, Arentz, Chisholm, Clark, Ghrist, Hartman, Howard, Impallaria, Jacobs, Malone, Miller, Morgan, Otto, and Saab
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the Power Plant Research Program to study and make recommendations regarding nuclear energy and its role as a renewable energy resource in the State; and requiring the Program to report to the Governor and the General Assembly by January 1, 2020, its recommendations regarding initiatives for the State and the General Assembly to responsibly and efficiently grow the nuclear industry in the State, support for emerging nuclear energy technologies, and utilization of nuclear energy to combat climate change.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2019
Legislative Date
2/06/2019
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2019
Legislative Date
2/07/2019
Action
Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2019
Legislative Date
3/19/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2019
Legislative Date
3/15/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {683493/1 Adopted
Proceedings
50 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2019
Legislative Date
3/15/2019
Action
Motion Special Order until 03/20 (Delegate Stewart) Adopted
Proceedings
50 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2019
Legislative Date
3/16/2019
Action
Motion Special Order until 03/21 (Delegate Stewart) Adopted
Proceedings
51 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2019
Legislative Date
3/16/2019
Action
Floor Amendment {653624/1 (Delegate D.E. Davis) Adopted
Proceedings
51AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2019
Legislative Date
3/16/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
51AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Study on the Future of Nuclear Energy in Maryland
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/22/2019
Legislative Date
3/17/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (102-34)
Proceedings
52 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/25/2019
Legislative Date
3/21/2019
Action
Referred Rules
Proceedings
53 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2019
Legislative Date
4/01/2019
Action
Rereferred to Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2019
Legislative Date
4/02/2019
Action
Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/06/2019 2/06/2019 First Reading Economic Matters
Text - First - Renewable Energy Portfolio Standard - Tier 1 Renewable Source - Nuclear Energy
House 2/07/2019 2/07/2019 Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/19/2019 3/19/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 3/19/2019 3/15/2019 Favorable with Amendments {683493/1 Adopted 50 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/19/2019 3/15/2019 Motion Special Order until 03/20 (Delegate Stewart) Adopted 50 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/20/2019 3/16/2019 Motion Special Order until 03/21 (Delegate Stewart) Adopted 51 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/21/2019 3/16/2019 Floor Amendment {653624/1 (Delegate D.E. Davis) Adopted 51AClick to view Recorded Media
House 3/21/2019 3/16/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 51AClick to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Study on the Future of Nuclear Energy in Maryland
House 3/22/2019 3/17/2019 Third Reading Passed (102-34) 52 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/25/2019 3/21/2019 Referred Rules 53 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/29/2019 4/01/2019 Rereferred to Finance
Senate 4/02/2019 4/02/2019 Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM
Click to return on the top page