Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Education - Loan Assistance - Professional Counselors and Alcohol and Drug Counselors
Sponsored by
Delegate Hubbard
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Office of Student Financial Assistance of the Maryland Higher Education Commission to assist in the repayment of specified higher education loans owed by licensed clinical professional counselors or licensed clinical alcohol and drug counselors under specified circumstances; requiring that funds for the Janet L. Hoffman Loan Assistance Repayment Program include specified money paid to the Program from specified fees collected by the State Board of Professional Counselors and Therapists; etc.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2013
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/30/2013
Legislative Date
1/31/2013
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2013
Legislative Date
2/06/2013
Action
Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/30/2013 1/31/2013 First Reading Ways and Means
House 2/06/2013 2/06/2013 Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
(   18-1501, 18-1502, 18-1504 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM
Click to return on the top page