Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Garrett County - Alcoholic Beverages - Sunday Sales for Off-Premises Consumption
Sponsored by
Garrett County Delegation
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 418
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing the holder of specified alcoholic beverages licenses in Garrett County to sell alcoholic beverages for consumption off the licensed premises on specified Sundays under specified circumstances; establishing the hours for sale on specified Sundays; establishing specified fees; submitting the Act to a referendum of the legally qualified voters of specified election districts and precincts of election districts in Garrett County; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2014
Contingency - on a referendum
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/30/2014
Legislative Date
1/31/2014
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/31/2014
Legislative Date
1/31/2014
Action
Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/06/2014
Legislative Date
3/07/2014
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2014
Legislative Date
3/07/2014
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
43A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2014
Legislative Date
3/07/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
43A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2014
Legislative Date
3/08/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (135-0)
Proceedings
44
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2014
Legislative Date
3/09/2014
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
43
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2014
Legislative Date
3/13/2014
Action
Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2014
Legislative Date
4/01/2014
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2014
Legislative Date
3/24/2014
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
58
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2014
Legislative Date
3/24/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
58
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2014
Legislative Date
3/26/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
60
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2014
Legislative Date
3/29/2014
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/05/2014
Legislative Date
5/05/2014
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 418
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/30/2014 1/31/2014 First Reading Economic Matters
House 1/31/2014 1/31/2014 Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/06/2014 3/07/2014 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 3/10/2014 3/07/2014 Favorable Report Adopted 43A
House 3/10/2014 3/07/2014 Second Reading Passed 43A
House 3/11/2014 3/08/2014 Third Reading Passed (135-0) 44
Senate 3/12/2014 3/09/2014 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 43
Senate 3/13/2014 3/13/2014 Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/31/2014 4/01/2014 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/02/2014 3/24/2014 Favorable Report Adopted 58
Senate 4/02/2014 3/24/2014 Second Reading Passed 58
Senate 4/04/2014 3/26/2014 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 60
House 4/05/2014 3/29/2014 Returned Passed 65
Post Passage 5/05/2014 5/05/2014 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 418
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM
Click to return on the top page