Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Washington County - Board of Education - Motor Fuel Tax Exemption
Sponsored by
Washington County Delegation
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing the Washington County Board of Education to claim a refund of motor fuel tax paid on motor fuel purchased for use in vehicles owned by the Washington County Board of Education; authorizing a school bus operator under contract with the Washington County Board of Education to claim a refund of motor fuel tax paid on motor fuel purchased for use in vehicles used to transport Washington County public school students; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0520
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2016
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2016
Legislative Date
2/08/2016
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2016
Legislative Date
2/10/2016
Action
Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/05/2016 2/08/2016 First Reading Ways and Means
House 2/10/2016 2/10/2016 Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
(   13-901 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM
Click to return on the top page