Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Home Act of 2016
Sponsored by
Delegates Lafferty and McIntosh
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Stating it is the intent of the General Assembly to deconcentrate poverty by providing additional opportunities for tenants utilizing public subsidies to live in neighborhoods other than the neighborhoods in which those individuals are currently and disproportionately residing; expanding the housing policy of the State regarding the provision of fair housing to include providing for fair housing regardless of source of income; prohibiting specified discriminatory acts based on a person's source of income; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2016
Legislative Date
2/08/2016
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2016
Legislative Date
2/10/2016
Action
Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/05/2016 2/08/2016 First Reading Environment and Transportation
House 2/10/2016 2/10/2016 Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Date Posted Document Name
2/09/2016 Text - First - Home Act of 2016
(   20-1103, 20-701, 20-702, 20-704, 20-705, 20-707 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM
Click to return on the top page