Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Health – Milk – Labeling
Sponsored by
Delegates Jacobs, Beitzel, Buckel, Ciliberti, Corderman, Cox, Grammer, Hornberger, Kerr, Pippy, and Wivell
Status
In the Senate - Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Prohibiting a person from stating on a label of a food product that the product is milk unless the product meets a certain definition; requiring the Maryland Department of Health to establish and implement a plan to enforce a certain prohibition, including notice of the Department's intent to implement a ban on all products that do not meet certain requirements, including plant-based products mislabeled as milk; and requiring the Department to notify the Department of Legislative Services within 10 days of a certain occurrence.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0922
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
Contingency - on federal, state, or local action
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2019
Legislative Date
2/08/2019
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Agriculture - Milk and Milk-Based Products - Labeling
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2019
Legislative Date
2/11/2019
Action
Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/15/2019
Legislative Date
2/15/2019
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/15/2019
Legislative Date
2/15/2019
Action
Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/15/2019
Legislative Date
2/15/2019
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/15/2019
Legislative Date
2/15/2019
Action
Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
4/05/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/28/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {310213/1 Adopted
Proceedings
63 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/28/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
63 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/29/2019
Action
Motion Special Order until Later This Session (Delegate Kipke) Adopted
Proceedings
64 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2019
Legislative Date
3/30/2019
Action
Motion Reconsider Second Reading (Delegate Stein) Adopted
Proceedings
65 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2019
Legislative Date
3/30/2019
Action
Floor Committee Amendment {840517/1 Adopted
Proceedings
65 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2019
Legislative Date
3/30/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
65 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Public Health – Milk – Labeling
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
3/31/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (107-32)
Proceedings
66 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
3/31/2019
Action
Referred Rules
Proceedings
63 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/08/2019
Action
Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/08/2019 2/08/2019 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Agriculture - Milk and Milk-Based Products - Labeling
House 2/11/2019 2/11/2019 Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/15/2019 2/15/2019 Hearing canceled
House 2/15/2019 2/15/2019 Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/15/2019 2/15/2019 Hearing canceled
House 2/15/2019 2/15/2019 Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/05/2019 4/05/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 4/05/2019 3/28/2019 Favorable with Amendments {310213/1 Adopted 63 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/05/2019 3/28/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 63 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/05/2019 3/29/2019 Motion Special Order until Later This Session (Delegate Kipke) Adopted 64 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/06/2019 3/30/2019 Motion Reconsider Second Reading (Delegate Stein) Adopted 65 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/06/2019 3/30/2019 Floor Committee Amendment {840517/1 Adopted 65 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/06/2019 3/30/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 65 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Public Health – Milk – Labeling
House 4/08/2019 3/31/2019 Third Reading Passed (107-32) 66 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2019 3/31/2019 Referred Rules 63 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2019 4/08/2019 Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
(   21-401, 21-424 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:31 PM
Click to return on the top page