Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Board of Morticians and Funeral Directors - Sunset Extension and Program Evaluation
Sponsored by
Chair, Health and Government Operations Committee
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 823
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Continuing the State Board of Morticians and Funeral Directors in accordance with the provisions of the Maryland Program Evaluation Act (sunset law) by extending to July 1, 2028, the termination provisions relating to the statutory and regulatory authority of the Board; requiring the Board to report by November 1, 2017, to specified committees of the General Assembly regarding the comparability of a specified provision of law to specified laws and regulations in other states; requiring specified workload and fiscal analyses; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0548
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2017
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/03/2017
Legislative Date
2/03/2017
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/03/2017
Legislative Date
2/03/2017
Action
Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2017
Legislative Date
3/18/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2017
Legislative Date
3/15/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {536988/1 Adopted
Proceedings
49 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2017
Legislative Date
3/15/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
49 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2017
Legislative Date
3/16/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (133-0)
Proceedings
50 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2017
Legislative Date
3/17/2017
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
46AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2017
Legislative Date
4/05/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/31/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {264534/1 Adopted
Proceedings
60 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/31/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
60 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2017
Legislative Date
4/01/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (44-1)
Proceedings
61 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2017
Legislative Date
4/01/2017
Action
House Refuses Concur Senate Amendments
Proceedings
66 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2017
Legislative Date
4/01/2017
Action
House Requests Senate Recede
Proceedings
66 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2017
Legislative Date
4/01/2017
Action
House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates Kelly, Cullison and McDonough)
Proceedings
66 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/02/2017
Action
House Refuses Concur Senate Amendments
Proceedings
62 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/02/2017
Action
House Requests Senate Recede
Proceedings
62 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/02/2017
Action
House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates Kelly, Cullison and McDonough)
Proceedings
62 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/02/2017
Action
Senate Refuses Recede
Proceedings
62 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/02/2017
Action
Senate Conference Committee Appointed (Senators Conway, Kagan and Bates)
Proceedings
62 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/03/2017
Action
Senate Refuses Recede
Proceedings
68 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/03/2017
Action
Senate Conference Committee Appointed (Senators Conway, Kagan and Bates)
Proceedings
68 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/04/2017
Action
Conference Committee Report {853329/1 Adopted
Proceedings
69 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/04/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (141-0)
Proceedings
69 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/03/2017
Action
Conference Committee Report {853329/1 Adopted
Proceedings
63AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/03/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (37-0)
Proceedings
63AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/04/2017
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/27/2017
Legislative Date
5/27/2017
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 823
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/03/2017 2/03/2017 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - State Board of Morticians and Funeral Directors - Sunset Extension and Program Evaluation
House 2/03/2017 2/03/2017 Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/18/2017 3/18/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/18/2017 3/15/2017 Favorable with Amendments {536988/1 Adopted 49 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/18/2017 3/15/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 49 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - State Board of Morticians and Funeral Directors - Sunset Extension and Program Evaluation
House 3/20/2017 3/16/2017 Third Reading Passed (133-0) 50 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/20/2017 3/17/2017 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 46AClick to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/05/2017 4/05/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/06/2017 3/31/2017 Favorable with Amendments {264534/1 Adopted 60 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/06/2017 3/31/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 60 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/07/2017 4/01/2017 Third Reading Passed (44-1) 61 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2017 4/01/2017 House Refuses Concur Senate Amendments 66 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2017 4/01/2017 House Requests Senate Recede 66 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2017 4/01/2017 House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates Kelly, Cullison and McDonough) 66 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/10/2017 4/02/2017 House Refuses Concur Senate Amendments 62 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/10/2017 4/02/2017 House Requests Senate Recede 62 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/10/2017 4/02/2017 House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates Kelly, Cullison and McDonough) 62 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/10/2017 4/02/2017 Senate Refuses Recede 62 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/10/2017 4/02/2017 Senate Conference Committee Appointed (Senators Conway, Kagan and Bates) 62 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/10/2017 4/03/2017 Senate Refuses Recede 68 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/10/2017 4/03/2017 Senate Conference Committee Appointed (Senators Conway, Kagan and Bates) 68 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/10/2017 4/04/2017 Conference Committee Report {853329/1 Adopted 69 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/10/2017 4/04/2017 Third Reading Passed (141-0) 69 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/10/2017 4/03/2017 Conference Committee Report {853329/1 Adopted 63AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/10/2017 4/03/2017 Third Reading Passed (37-0) 63AClick to view Recorded Media
House 4/10/2017 4/04/2017 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - State Board of Morticians and Funeral Directors - Sunset Extension and Program Evaluation
Post Passage 5/27/2017 5/27/2017 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 823
Text - Chapter - State Board of Morticians and Funeral Directors - Sunset Extension and Program Evaluation
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:31 PM
Click to return on the top page