Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Prescription Drug Monitoring Program - Disclosure of Data - Managed Care Organizations
Sponsored by
Delegates R. Lewis and Cullison
Status
In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Prescription Drug Monitoring Program to disclose prescription monitoring data, in accordance with certain regulations, to the medical director or the designee of the medical director of Medicaid managed care organizations for the purpose of complying with the Corrective Managed Care Program of the Maryland Medicaid Pharmacy Program or the standards developed by the Maryland Medicaid Opioid Drug Utilization Review Workgroup.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0498
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2019
Legislative Date
2/08/2019
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/13/2019
Legislative Date
2/13/2019
Action
Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2019
Legislative Date
3/28/2019
Action
Withdrawn by Sponsor
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/08/2019 2/08/2019 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Prescription Drug Monitoring Program - Disclosure of Data - Managed Care Organizations
House 2/13/2019 2/13/2019 Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/28/2019 3/28/2019 Withdrawn by Sponsor
(   21-2A-06 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:31 PM
Click to return on the top page