Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Energy Administration - Study on Location of Solar Photovoltaic Technologies
Sponsored by
Delegates West and Stein
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Maryland Energy Administration to study the effect that an increase in the State's renewable energy portfolio standard, to include the increase in the percentage of energy required to be from solar energy, will have on the State's reliance on energy from solar photovoltaic technologies; establishing certain requirements for the study; requiring the Administration to solicit input from certain persons; and requiring the Administration to submit a report to the Governor and the General Assembly by December 31, 2019.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2018
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/02/2018
Legislative Date
2/02/2018
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2018
Legislative Date
2/09/2018
Action
Hearing 3/12 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2018
Legislative Date
3/15/2018
Action
Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/02/2018 2/02/2018 First Reading Economic Matters
Text - First - Maryland Energy Administration - Study on Location of Solar Photovoltaic Technologies
House 2/09/2018 2/09/2018 Hearing 3/12 at 2:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/15/2018 3/15/2018 Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:31 PM
Click to return on the top page