Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Howard County – Alcoholic Beverages – Marketplace License Ho. Co. 06–19
Sponsored by
Howard County Delegation
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 701
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing a marketplace license in Howard County; authorizing the Board of License Commissioners to issue the license to certain individuals; requiring an applicant for a marketplace license to include a list of the names of vendors and agents within the marketplace that will be authorized to sell beer, wine, and liquor under the license; authorizing a license holder to obtain a refillable container permit and a nonrefillable container permit under certain conditions; establishing an annual license fee of $6,000; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2019
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2019
Legislative Date
2/08/2019
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2019
Legislative Date
2/08/2019
Action
Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2019
Legislative Date
3/13/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2019
Legislative Date
3/12/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/14/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (136-0)
Proceedings
49 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/16/2019
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2019
Legislative Date
3/19/2019
Action
Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2019
Legislative Date
4/01/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2019
Legislative Date
3/26/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
58 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2019
Legislative Date
3/27/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
59AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2019
Legislative Date
3/24/2019
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
59 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/25/2019
Legislative Date
5/25/2019
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 701
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/08/2019 2/08/2019 First Reading Economic Matters
Text - First - Howard County – Alcoholic Beverages – Marketplace License Ho. Co. 06–19
House 2/08/2019 2/08/2019 Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/13/2019 3/13/2019 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 3/15/2019 3/12/2019 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 47 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Howard County – Alcoholic Beverages – Marketplace License Ho. Co. 06–19
House 3/18/2019 3/14/2019 Third Reading Passed (136-0) 49 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2019 3/16/2019 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 48 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/19/2019 3/19/2019 Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/01/2019 4/01/2019 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/01/2019 3/26/2019 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 58 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/02/2019 3/27/2019 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 59AClick to view Recorded Media
House 4/03/2019 3/24/2019 Returned Passed 59 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/25/2019 5/25/2019 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 701
Text - Chapter - Howard County – Alcoholic Beverages – Marketplace License Ho. Co. 06–19
(   23-1004.1, 23-102 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:31 PM
Click to return on the top page