Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Sales and Use Tax – Short–Term Rentals
Sponsored by
Delegate Mosby
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 704
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring certain short-term rental platforms to collect the sales and use tax on the sale of the right to occupy certain short-term rentals.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2019
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2019
Legislative Date
2/08/2019
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Sales and Use Tax - Limited Residential Lodging
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2019
Legislative Date
2/12/2019
Action
Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
4/05/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/28/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {355863/1 Adopted
Proceedings
63 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/28/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
63 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Sales and Use Tax – Short–Term Rentals
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/29/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (101-32)
Proceedings
64 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
3/31/2019
Action
Referred Rules
Proceedings
63 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/08/2019
Action
Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/08/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/02/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
65 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/02/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
65 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/03/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
66 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/02/2019
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
68 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/25/2019
Legislative Date
5/25/2019
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 704
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Sales and Use Tax – Short–Term Rentals
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/08/2019 2/08/2019 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Sales and Use Tax - Limited Residential Lodging
House 2/12/2019 2/12/2019 Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/05/2019 4/05/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 4/05/2019 3/28/2019 Favorable with Amendments {355863/1 Adopted 63 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/05/2019 3/28/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 63 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Sales and Use Tax – Short–Term Rentals
House 4/05/2019 3/29/2019 Third Reading Passed (101-32) 64 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2019 3/31/2019 Referred Rules 63 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2019 4/08/2019 Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2019 4/08/2019 Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 4/08/2019 4/02/2019 Favorable Adopted 65 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2019 4/02/2019 Second Reading Passed 65 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2019 4/03/2019 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 66 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2019 4/02/2019 Returned Passed 68 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/25/2019 5/25/2019 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 704
Text - Chapter - Sales and Use Tax – Short–Term Rentals
(   11-101, 11-102, 11-403 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:31 PM
Click to return on the top page