Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Personnel - Equality for Maryland Caregivers Act of 2013
Sponsored by
Delegates M. Washington, Anderson, Barkley, Braveboy, Cullison, Glenn, Gutierrez, Haynes, Hucker, Ivey, Kaiser, A. Kelly, Mitchell, Olszewski, B. Robinson, Stukes, Summers, and Zucker
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Providing specified collective bargaining rights to specified employees of the University of Maryland Medical Center.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0759
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2013
Legislative Date
2/07/2013
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/20/2013
Legislative Date
2/20/2013
Action
Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/06/2013 2/07/2013 First Reading Appropriations
House 2/20/2013 2/20/2013 Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM
Click to return on the top page