Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Cooperative Housing Corporations, Condominiums, and Homeowners Associations - Reserve Studies
Sponsored by
Delegate Holmes
Status
In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the governing body of certain cooperative housing corporations, condominiums, and homeowners associations to have a reserve study conducted by a certain date and at 5-year intervals under certain circumstances; requiring a certain reserve study to meet certain criteria; establishing that the governing body of a cooperative housing corporation or a homeowners association and the board of directors of a condominium have authority to increase a certain assessment notwithstanding certain provisions; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2019
Legislative Date
2/08/2019
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2019
Legislative Date
2/11/2019
Action
Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2019
Legislative Date
3/29/2019
Action
Withdrawn by Sponsor
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/08/2019 2/08/2019 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Cooperative Housing Corporations, Condominiums, and Homeowners Associations - Reserve Studies
House 2/11/2019 2/11/2019 Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/29/2019 3/29/2019 Withdrawn by Sponsor
(   11-109, 11-109.2, 11-109.4, 11-110, 11B-106.1, 11B-112.2, 11B-112.3, 11B-117 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:31 PM
Click to return on the top page