Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Pharmacy Benefits Managers - Prescription Drugs - Maximum Allowable Cost Prices
Sponsored by
Delegate Kach
Status
In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring a pharmacy benefits manager to disclose to a purchaser and specify in its contract with a purchaser information relating to maximum allowable cost prices for prescription drugs; requiring a pharmacy benefits manager to specify in its contract with a pharmacy or pharmacist information relating to maximum allowable drug prices for prescription drugs; requiring a pharmacy benefits manager to update the maximum allowable cost prices with a specified frequency; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2013
Legislative Date
2/07/2013
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/13/2013
Legislative Date
2/13/2013
Action
Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2013
Legislative Date
3/28/2013
Action
Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/06/2013 2/07/2013 First Reading Health and Government Operations
House 2/13/2013 2/13/2013 Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/27/2013 3/28/2013 Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
(   15-1623, 15-1628.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM
Click to return on the top page