Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Safety - Handgun Permit - Renewal
Sponsored by
Delegates Saab, Buckel, Clark, S. Howard, Kipke, Krebs, Miele, Morgan, Rey, Sample-Hughes, Szeliga, and West
Status
In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Synopsis
Repealing the requirement that an applicant complete a certain firearms training course prior to a renewal of a permit to carry, wear, or transport a handgun; altering the term of a renewal permit; and limiting the number of times that a permit may be renewed.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2018
Legislative Date
2/05/2018
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Public Safety - Handgun Permit - Renewal
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2018
Legislative Date
2/12/2018
Action
Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/22/2018
Legislative Date
2/22/2018
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/05/2018
Action
Withdrawn by Sponsor
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/05/2018 2/05/2018 First Reading Judiciary
Text - First - Public Safety - Handgun Permit - Renewal
House 2/12/2018 2/12/2018 Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/22/2018 2/22/2018 Hearing canceled
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/05/2018 3/05/2018 Withdrawn by Sponsor
(   5-306, 5-309 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:31 PM
Click to return on the top page