Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Child Support - Health Insurance - Definition
Sponsored by
Delegates McComas, Glass, Impallaria, Jalisi, Krebs, Malone, McDonough, McKay, Morgan, Parrott, Patterson, Reilly, Sophocleus, and Vogt
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 739
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Defining the term "health insurance" to include medical insurance, dental insurance, prescription drug coverage, and vision insurance for purposes of calculating a child support obligation under the child support guidelines.
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0850 Session: 2016 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2017
Legislative Date
2/06/2017
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Child Support - Health Insurance - Definition
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2017
Legislative Date
2/08/2017
Action
Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2017
Legislative Date
3/13/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2017
Legislative Date
3/11/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
45 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Child Support - Health Insurance - Definition
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2017
Legislative Date
3/12/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (126-1)
Proceedings
46AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2017
Legislative Date
3/16/2017
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
45 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2017
Legislative Date
3/17/2017
Action
Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/10/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/02/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
62 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/02/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
62 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/03/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
63AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/04/2017
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
69 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/25/2017
Legislative Date
5/25/2017
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 739
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Child Support - Health Insurance - Definition
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/06/2017 2/06/2017 First Reading Judiciary
Text - First - Child Support - Health Insurance - Definition
House 2/08/2017 2/08/2017 Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/13/2017 3/13/2017 Favorable Report by Judiciary
House 3/14/2017 3/11/2017 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 45 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Child Support - Health Insurance - Definition
House 3/15/2017 3/12/2017 Third Reading Passed (126-1) 46AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/16/2017 3/16/2017 Referred Judicial Proceedings 45 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/17/2017 3/17/2017 Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/10/2017 4/10/2017 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/10/2017 4/02/2017 Favorable Adopted 62 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/10/2017 4/02/2017 Second Reading Passed 62 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/10/2017 4/03/2017 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 63AClick to view Recorded Media
House 4/10/2017 4/04/2017 Returned Passed 69 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/25/2017 5/25/2017 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 739
Text - Chapter - Child Support - Health Insurance - Definition
(   12-201 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:31 PM
Click to return on the top page