Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Business Regulation - Household Goods Movers - Registration
Sponsored by
Delegates Flanagan, Aumann, Brooks, Tarlau, and Wilson
Status
In the Senate - Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Prohibiting a person from providing household goods moving services in the State unless the person is registered as a household goods mover under the Act; requiring a person to submit to the Department of Labor, Licensing, and Regulation a certain application and a certain fee to apply for a certain registration; requiring a household goods mover to pay an annual registration fee established by the Department; establishing that a violation of the Act is a misdemeanor and on conviction a violator is subject to a fine of up to $1,000; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2018
Legislative Date
2/05/2018
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Business Regulation - Household Goods Movers - Registration
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2018
Legislative Date
2/06/2018
Action
Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2018
Legislative Date
3/07/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2018
Legislative Date
3/08/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {703894/1 Adopted
Proceedings
42 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2018
Legislative Date
3/08/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
42 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Business Regulation - Household Goods Movers - Registration
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2018
Legislative Date
3/11/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (112-23)
Proceedings
45 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2018
Legislative Date
3/15/2018
Action
Referred Finance
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/23/2018
Legislative Date
3/23/2018
Action
Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2018
Legislative Date
4/06/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2018
Legislative Date
4/01/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {277770/1 Adopted
Proceedings
63 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2018
Legislative Date
4/01/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
63 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/05/2018 2/05/2018 First Reading Economic Matters
Text - First - Business Regulation - Household Goods Movers - Registration
House 2/06/2018 2/06/2018 Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/07/2018 3/07/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 3/08/2018 3/08/2018 Favorable with Amendments {703894/1 Adopted 42 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/08/2018 3/08/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 42 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Business Regulation - Household Goods Movers - Registration
House 3/14/2018 3/11/2018 Third Reading Passed (112-23) 45 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/15/2018 3/15/2018 Referred Finance 47 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/23/2018 3/23/2018 Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/06/2018 4/06/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 4/06/2018 4/01/2018 Favorable with Amendments {277770/1 Adopted 63 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/06/2018 4/01/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 63 Click to view Recorded Media
(   8.5-101 through 8.5-106 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:31 PM
Click to return on the top page