Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Correctional Services - Prison Artists Marketplace Program - Establishment
Sponsored by
Delegate C. Howard
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Department of Public Safety and Correctional Services to establish the Prison Artists Marketplace Program; specifying that the purpose of the Program is to display and sell artistic works created by inmates during a term of incarceration; requiring that the artistic works be sold at a marketplace at Druid Hill Park in Baltimore City; requiring a specified distribution of the proceeds from the sale of artistic works; stating it is the intent of the General Assembly to employ inmates who are eligible for work release; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0469
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2017
Legislative Date
2/06/2017
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2017
Legislative Date
2/07/2017
Action
Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/27/2017
Legislative Date
2/27/2017
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/06/2017 2/06/2017 First Reading Judiciary
House 2/07/2017 2/07/2017 Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Correctional Services - Prison Artists Marketplace Program - Establishment
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/27/2017 2/27/2017 Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:31 PM
Click to return on the top page