Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Personnel – Collective Bargaining – Exclusive Representative Access to New Employee Program
Sponsored by
Delegates Korman, B. Barnes, Haynes, Jones, Krimm, McIntosh, Reznik, Sophocleus, Tarlau, and P. Young
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 24
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the Department of Budget and Management, University System of Maryland system institutions, Morgan State University, St. Mary's College of Maryland, and Baltimore City Community College to provide certain information on certain employees to certain exclusive representatives within 30 days of a new employee's date of hire; requiring an exclusive representative to withhold certain communication with an employee on the written request of the employee with certain exceptions; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0677
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2018
Legislative Date
2/07/2018
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2018
Legislative Date
2/12/2018
Action
Hearing 2/23 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2018
Legislative Date
3/12/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2018
Legislative Date
3/10/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {994869/1 Adopted
Proceedings
44 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2018
Legislative Date
3/10/2018
Action
Motion Special Order until Next Session (Delegate Shoemaker) Adopted
Proceedings
44 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2018
Legislative Date
3/11/2018
Action
Floor Amendment {353722/1 (Delegate Krebs) Adopted
Proceedings
45 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2018
Legislative Date
3/11/2018
Action
Floor Amendment {653024/1 (Delegate Krebs) Rejected (47-87)
Proceedings
45 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2018
Legislative Date
3/11/2018
Action
Floor Amendment {513427/1 (Delegate Krebs) Rejected (47-86)
Proceedings
45 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2018
Legislative Date
3/11/2018
Action
Floor Amendment {203220/1 (Delegate Shoemaker) Rejected (47-87)
Proceedings
45 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2018
Legislative Date
3/11/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
45 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2018
Legislative Date
3/12/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (87-48)
Proceedings
46AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Referred Finance
Proceedings
48AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2018
Legislative Date
3/22/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2018
Legislative Date
3/20/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
51 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2018
Legislative Date
3/20/2018
Action
Motion Special Order until 3/23 (Senator Hershey) Adopted
Proceedings
51 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/23/2018
Legislative Date
3/21/2018
Action
Floor Amendment {283524/1 (Senator Middleton) Adopted (45-0)
Proceedings
52 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/23/2018
Legislative Date
3/21/2018
Action
Floor Amendment {373422/1 (Senator Hershey) Rejected (14-31)
Proceedings
52 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/23/2018
Legislative Date
3/21/2018
Action
Floor Amendment {253624/1 (Senator Cassilly) Rejected (15-30)
Proceedings
52 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/23/2018
Legislative Date
3/21/2018
Action
Floor Amendment {413823/1 (Senator Jennings) Rejected (14-31)
Proceedings
52 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/23/2018
Legislative Date
3/21/2018
Action
Floor Amendment {463421/1 (Senator Hershey) Rejected (15-30)
Proceedings
52 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/23/2018
Legislative Date
3/21/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
52 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/26/2018
Legislative Date
3/22/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (33-14)
Proceedings
53 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2018
Legislative Date
3/21/2018
Action
House Concurs Senate Amendments
Proceedings
55 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2018
Legislative Date
3/21/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (90-49)
Proceedings
55 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2018
Legislative Date
3/21/2018
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
4/05/2018
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 24
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/07/2018 2/07/2018 First Reading Appropriations
Text - First - State Personnel - Collective Bargaining - Exclusive Representative Access to New Employee Orientation
House 2/12/2018 2/12/2018 Hearing 2/23 at 2:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/12/2018 3/12/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
House 3/13/2018 3/10/2018 Favorable with Amendments {994869/1 Adopted 44 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/13/2018 3/10/2018 Motion Special Order until Next Session (Delegate Shoemaker) Adopted 44 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/14/2018 3/11/2018 Floor Amendment {353722/1 (Delegate Krebs) Adopted 45 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/14/2018 3/11/2018 Floor Amendment {653024/1 (Delegate Krebs) Rejected (47-87) 45 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/14/2018 3/11/2018 Floor Amendment {513427/1 (Delegate Krebs) Rejected (47-86) 45 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/14/2018 3/11/2018 Floor Amendment {203220/1 (Delegate Shoemaker) Rejected (47-87) 45 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/14/2018 3/11/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 45 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - State Personnel – Collective Bargaining – Exclusive Representative Access to New Employee Program
House 3/15/2018 3/12/2018 Third Reading Passed (87-48) 46AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/16/2018 3/16/2018 Referred Finance 48AClick to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/22/2018 3/22/2018 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 3/22/2018 3/20/2018 Favorable Adopted 51 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/22/2018 3/20/2018 Motion Special Order until 3/23 (Senator Hershey) Adopted 51 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/23/2018 3/21/2018 Floor Amendment {283524/1 (Senator Middleton) Adopted (45-0) 52 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/23/2018 3/21/2018 Floor Amendment {373422/1 (Senator Hershey) Rejected (14-31) 52 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/23/2018 3/21/2018 Floor Amendment {253624/1 (Senator Cassilly) Rejected (15-30) 52 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/23/2018 3/21/2018 Floor Amendment {413823/1 (Senator Jennings) Rejected (14-31) 52 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/23/2018 3/21/2018 Floor Amendment {463421/1 (Senator Hershey) Rejected (15-30) 52 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/23/2018 3/21/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 52 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/26/2018 3/22/2018 Third Reading Passed (33-14) 53 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/28/2018 3/21/2018 House Concurs Senate Amendments 55 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/28/2018 3/21/2018 Third Reading Passed (90-49) 55 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/28/2018 3/21/2018 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - State Personnel – Collective Bargaining – Exclusive Representative Access to New Employee Program
Post Passage 4/05/2018 4/05/2018 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 24
Text - Chapter - State Personnel – Collective Bargaining – Exclusive Representative Access to New Employee Program
(   3-208, 3-2A-08, 3-307, 3-502 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:31 PM
Click to return on the top page