Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Criminal Law - Human Trafficking - Penalties (Human Trafficking Reform Act)
Sponsored by
Delegate Grammer
Status
In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Synopsis
Altering penalties for the crime of human trafficking; decriminalizing prostitution committed by a minor; repealing a certain requirement that a certain individual be charged with violating a certain provision of law before a defendant may raise a certain affirmative defense; requiring a certain person to provide certain referral services to a certain minor under certain circumstances; and classifying human trafficking as a crime of violence under a certain provision of law.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2019
Legislative Date
2/08/2019
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2019
Legislative Date
2/11/2019
Action
Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/19/2019
Legislative Date
2/19/2019
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/25/2019
Legislative Date
2/25/2019
Action
Withdrawn by Sponsor
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/08/2019 2/08/2019 First Reading Judiciary
Text - First - Criminal Law - Human Trafficking - Penalties (Human Trafficking Reform Act)
House 2/11/2019 2/11/2019 Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/19/2019 2/19/2019 Hearing canceled
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/25/2019 2/25/2019 Withdrawn by Sponsor
(   11-303, 11-306, 14-101 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:31 PM
Click to return on the top page