Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Fiduciary Institutions - Disclosure of Financial Records - Federal Investigation Agencies
Sponsored by
Delegates W. Miller and B. Wilson
Status
In the House - Rereferred to Economic Matters
Analysis
Synopsis
Providing that a specified fiduciary institution is not prohibited from disclosing to a federal investigation agency, without a subpoena being served on the institution, an individual's financial records for use by the federal investigation agency only in the investigation of a federal criminal case in the State; defining "federal investigation agency"; and making a technical correction.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2015
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/13/2015
Legislative Date
2/16/2015
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2015
Legislative Date
3/09/2015
Action
Rereferred to Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/13/2015 2/16/2015 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
House 3/09/2015 3/09/2015 Rereferred to Economic Matters
(   1-301, 1-302, 1-303, 1-304 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM
Click to return on the top page