Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Safety - National Railroad Passenger Corporation (AMTRAK) Police Force
Sponsored by
Delegate Cluster
Status
In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing the National Railroad Passenger Corporation (AMTRAK) police force; limiting the law enforcement powers of National Railroad Passenger Corporation (AMTRAK) police officers to certain property; specifying certain conditions under which National Railroad Passenger Corporation (AMTRAK) police officers may exercise law enforcement powers on certain property; requiring the Maryland Police Training and Standards Commission to adopt certain regulations; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2018
Legislative Date
2/08/2018
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2018
Legislative Date
2/12/2018
Action
Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/05/2018
Action
Withdrawn by Sponsor
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/08/2018 2/08/2018 First Reading Judiciary
Text - First - Public Safety - National Railroad Passenger Corporation (AMTRAK) Police Force
House 2/12/2018 2/12/2018 Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/05/2018 3/05/2018 Withdrawn by Sponsor
(   3-101, 3-201 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM
Click to return on the top page