Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
University of Maryland School of Public Health, Center for Health Equity - Workgroup on Health in All Policies
Sponsored by
Delegates R. Lewis, Clippinger, Frush, Healey, McCray, and McIntosh
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 558
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the University of Maryland School of Public Health, Center for Health Equity, in consultation with the Department of Health and Mental Hygiene, to convene a workgroup to study and make recommendations to units of State and local government on laws and policies to implement that will positively impact the health of residents of the State; requiring the University of Maryland School of Public Health, Center for Health Equity, to report the workgroup findings to the General Assembly by January 31, 2018; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0340
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2017
Creates a Task Force or Commission
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2017
Legislative Date
2/10/2017
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/15/2017
Legislative Date
2/15/2017
Action
Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2017
Legislative Date
3/18/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2017
Legislative Date
3/15/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {786086/1 Adopted
Proceedings
49 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2017
Legislative Date
3/15/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
49 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2017
Legislative Date
3/17/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (140-0)
Proceedings
51 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2017
Legislative Date
3/19/2017
Action
Referred Finance Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2017
Legislative Date
3/30/2017
Action
Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2017
Legislative Date
4/07/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/02/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
62 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/02/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
62 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/03/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
63AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/04/2017
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
69 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/04/2017
Legislative Date
5/04/2017
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 558
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/10/2017 2/10/2017 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - University of Maryland School of Public Health, Center for Health Equity - Workgroup on Health in All Policies
House 2/15/2017 2/15/2017 Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/18/2017 3/18/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/18/2017 3/15/2017 Favorable with Amendments {786086/1 Adopted 49 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/18/2017 3/15/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 49 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - University of Maryland School of Public Health, Center for Health Equity - Workgroup on Health in All Policies
House 3/20/2017 3/17/2017 Third Reading Passed (140-0) 51 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/21/2017 3/19/2017 Referred Finance Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 48 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/30/2017 3/30/2017 Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance)
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/07/2017 4/07/2017 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 4/10/2017 4/02/2017 Favorable Adopted 62 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/10/2017 4/02/2017 Second Reading Passed 62 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/10/2017 4/03/2017 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 63AClick to view Recorded Media
House 4/10/2017 4/04/2017 Returned Passed 69 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/04/2017 5/04/2017 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 558
Text - Chapter - University of Maryland School of Public Health, Center for Health Equity - Workgroup on Health in All Policies
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM
Click to return on the top page