Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Solar Energy Grant Program - Revisions
Sponsored by
Delegates Clippinger and Brooks
Status
In the Senate - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering the maximum grant amount that the Maryland Energy Administration may award to certain properties under the Solar Energy Grant Program; prohibiting the Administration from denying a grant application for a certain property except under certain circumstances; and establishing the maximum grant amount of $3,000 for a building with not more than 5 dwelling units.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0879
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2018
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2018
Legislative Date
2/08/2018
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Solar Energy Grant Program - Revisions
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2018
Legislative Date
2/09/2018
Action
Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/19/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/14/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {873395/1 Adopted
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/14/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Solar Energy Grant Program - Revisions
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/15/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (135-3)
Proceedings
49 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Referred Finance
Proceedings
48BClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2018
Legislative Date
3/21/2018
Action
Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/09/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/04/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {937570/1 Adopted
Proceedings
66 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/04/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
66 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/05/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
67 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/08/2018 2/08/2018 First Reading Economic Matters
Text - First - Solar Energy Grant Program - Revisions
House 2/09/2018 2/09/2018 Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/19/2018 3/19/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 3/19/2018 3/14/2018 Favorable with Amendments {873395/1 Adopted 48 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/19/2018 3/14/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 48 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Solar Energy Grant Program - Revisions
House 3/19/2018 3/15/2018 Third Reading Passed (135-3) 49 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/19/2018 3/16/2018 Referred Finance 48BClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/21/2018 3/21/2018 Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/09/2018 4/09/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 4/09/2018 4/04/2018 Favorable with Amendments {937570/1 Adopted 66 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/09/2018 4/04/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 66 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/09/2018 4/05/2018 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 67 Click to view Recorded Media
(   9-2007, 9-20B-05 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM
Click to return on the top page