Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Environment - Nonwoven Disposable Products - Advertising and Labeling
Sponsored by
Delegates Frush and Gutierrez
Status
In the House - Referred to interim study by Economic Matters
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting the manufacturer of a nonwoven disposable product from, beginning January 1, 2018, advertising or labeling the nonwoven disposable product in a specified manner unless the nonwoven disposable product is flushable; and requiring the manufacturer of a nonwoven disposable product to label a nonwoven disposable product in a specified manner beginning January 1, 2018.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0280
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2017
Legislative Date
2/10/2017
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Environment - Nonwoven Disposable Products - Advertising and Labeling
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2017
Legislative Date
2/10/2017
Action
Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2017
Legislative Date
3/17/2017
Action
Referred to interim study by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/10/2017 2/10/2017 First Reading Economic Matters
Text - First - Environment - Nonwoven Disposable Products - Advertising and Labeling
House 2/10/2017 2/10/2017 Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/17/2017 3/17/2017 Referred to interim study by Economic Matters
(   9-258 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM
Click to return on the top page