Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Workers' Compensation - Occupational Disease - Post-Traumatic Stress Disorder
Sponsored by
Delegate Rosenberg
Status
In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Synopsis
Creating a presumption that, for purposes of workers' compensation, a first responder suffering from post-traumatic stress disorder is suffering from an occupational disease that was suffered in the line of duty and is compensable under specified circumstances; providing that a specified employee who is eligible for benefits under the Act or that employee's dependents shall receive the benefits in addition to specified retirement benefits; etc.
Committees
Opposite:
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2013
Legislative Date
2/08/2013
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2013
Legislative Date
2/08/2013
Action
Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/18/2013
Legislative Date
2/18/2013
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/25/2013
Legislative Date
2/26/2013
Action
Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/08/2013 2/08/2013 First Reading Economic Matters
House 2/08/2013 2/08/2013 Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/18/2013 2/18/2013 Hearing cancelled
House 2/25/2013 2/26/2013 Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM
Click to return on the top page