Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Board of Physicians and Allied Health Advisory Committees - Sunset Extension and Program Evaluation
Sponsored by
Chair, Health and Government Operations Committee
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 218
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Continuing the State Board of Physicians and the related allied health advisory committees in accordance with the provisions of the Maryland Program Evaluation Act (Sunset Law) by extending the related termination provisions to July 1, 2023; altering the circumstances under which the State Board of Physicians may renew or reinstate a license to practice medicine; requiring a disciplinary panel, before any action is taken, to give an individual an opportunity for a hearing before a hearing officer; etc.
Details
Emergency Bill
Cross-filed with: SB0549
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): Upon Enactment
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2017
Legislative Date
2/10/2017
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/15/2017
Legislative Date
2/15/2017
Action
Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2017
Legislative Date
3/07/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2017
Legislative Date
3/08/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {586585/1 Adopted
Proceedings
41 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2017
Legislative Date
3/08/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
41 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2017
Legislative Date
3/10/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
43 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2017
Legislative Date
3/13/2017
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
42 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2017
Legislative Date
4/07/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/02/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {164136/1 Adopted
Proceedings
62 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/02/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
62 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/03/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
63AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/05/2017
Action
House Concurs Senate Amendments
Proceedings
70 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/05/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (133-0)
Proceedings
70 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/05/2017
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/18/2017
Legislative Date
4/18/2017
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 218
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/10/2017 2/10/2017 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - State Board of Physicians and Allied Health Advisory Committees - Sunset Extension and Program Evaluation
House 2/15/2017 2/15/2017 Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/07/2017 3/07/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/08/2017 3/08/2017 Favorable with Amendments {586585/1 Adopted 41 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/08/2017 3/08/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 41 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - State Board of Physicians and Allied Health Advisory Committees - Sunset Extension and Program Evaluation
House 3/10/2017 3/10/2017 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 43 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/13/2017 3/13/2017 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 42 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/07/2017 4/07/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/10/2017 4/02/2017 Favorable with Amendments {164136/1 Adopted 62 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/10/2017 4/02/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 62 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/10/2017 4/03/2017 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 63AClick to view Recorded Media
House 4/10/2017 4/05/2017 House Concurs Senate Amendments 70 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/10/2017 4/05/2017 Third Reading Passed (133-0) 70 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/10/2017 4/05/2017 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - State Board of Physicians and Allied Health Advisory Committees - Sunset Extension and Program Evaluation
Post Passage 4/18/2017 4/18/2017 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 218
Text - Chapter - State Board of Physicians and Allied Health Advisory Committees - Sunset Extension and Program Evaluation
(   1-212, 12-6A-03, 14-101, 14-205, 14-205.1, 14-205.2, 14-206, 14-302, 14-302.1, 14-316, 14-401.1, 14-405, 14-411.1, 14-413, 14-414, 14-5A-13, 14-5A-17, 14-5A-23, 14-5A-25, 14-5B-12, 14-5B-14, 14-5B-21, 14-5C-14, 14-5C-14.1, 14-5C-17, 14-5C-25, 14-5D-12, 14-5D-14, 14-5D-18, 14-5D-20, 14-5E-13, 14-5E-16, 14-5E-23, 14-5E-25, 14-5F-15, 14-5F-15.1, 14-5F-18, 14-5F-25, 14-5F-29, 14-5F-32, 14-606, 14-702, 15-307, 15-311, 15-313, 15-315, 15-502 )
(   1988, 1992, 1994, 2007 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM
Click to return on the top page