Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Prince George's County - Bowie Senior Center
Sponsored by
Delegates Vallario, Holmes, and Valentino-Smith
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing the creation of a State Debt not to exceed $100,000, the proceeds to be used as a grant to the Mayor and City Council of the City of Bowie for the acquisition, planning, design, construction, repair, renovation, reconstruction, and capital equipping of the Bowie Senior Center, located in Prince George's County; providing for disbursement of the loan proceeds, subject to a requirement that the grantee provide and expend a matching fund; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2015
NOTE: Bond bills that received funding in fiscal 2016 were amended into the State's Capital budget (HB 71). Individual bond bills were not acted upon by the legislature, instead the General Assembly amended HB 71 to specifically list the projects it selected for Bond Funding.
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2015
Legislative Date
3/10/2015
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2015
Legislative Date
3/10/2015
Action
Motion Rules Suspended for late introduction (Delegate Vallario) Adopted (135-0)
Proceedings
40
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2015
Legislative Date
3/10/2015
Action
Referred House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
40
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2015
Legislative Date
3/12/2015
Action
Rereferred to Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2015
Legislative Date
3/12/2015
Action
Hearing 3/14 at 3:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2015
Legislative Date
3/12/2015
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2015
Legislative Date
3/12/2015
Action
Hearing 3/14 at 11:00 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2015
Legislative Date
3/13/2015
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2015
Legislative Date
3/13/2015
Action
Hearing 3/14 at 9:00 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/13/2015
Action
Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 3/10/2015 3/10/2015 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
House 3/10/2015 3/10/2015 Motion Rules Suspended for late introduction (Delegate Vallario) Adopted (135-0) 40
House 3/10/2015 3/10/2015 Referred House Rules and Executive Nominations 40
House 3/11/2015 3/12/2015 Rereferred to Appropriations
House 3/12/2015 3/12/2015 Hearing 3/14 at 3:00 p.m.
House 3/12/2015 3/12/2015 Hearing cancelled
House 3/12/2015 3/12/2015 Hearing 3/14 at 11:00 a.m.
House 3/13/2015 3/13/2015 Hearing cancelled
House 3/13/2015 3/13/2015 Hearing 3/14 at 9:00 a.m.
House 4/13/2015 4/13/2015 Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM
Click to return on the top page