Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Higher Education - Cyber Warrior Diversity Program - Revisions
Sponsored by
Delegate Glenn
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 455
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering the locations of the Cyber Warrior Diversity Program in the State to include the University of Maryland Baltimore County Training Centers that are located in the State; specifying the amounts and uses of certain grants provided under the Program; altering the date from November 1, 2018 to on or before December 15, 2019, and each December 15 thereafter, that the governing entities must notify the Maryland Higher Education Commission regarding the number of students enrolled in the Program for the academic year; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0432
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2019
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/15/2019
Legislative Date
2/15/2019
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Higher Education - Cyber Warrior Diversity Program - Revisions
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2019
Legislative Date
3/08/2019
Action
Rereferred to Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2019
Legislative Date
3/12/2019
Action
Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2019
Legislative Date
4/02/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2019
Legislative Date
3/23/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {394062/1 Adopted
Proceedings
58 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2019
Legislative Date
3/23/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
58 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Higher Education - Cyber Warrior Diversity Program - Revisions
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2019
Legislative Date
3/25/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
60 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2019
Legislative Date
3/29/2019
Action
Referred Rules
Proceedings
61 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
4/05/2019
Action
Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/08/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/01/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
64 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/01/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
64 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/02/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
65 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/02/2019
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
68 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/13/2019
Legislative Date
5/13/2019
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 455
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Higher Education - Cyber Warrior Diversity Program - Revisions
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/15/2019 2/15/2019 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Text - First - Higher Education - Cyber Warrior Diversity Program - Revisions
House 3/08/2019 3/08/2019 Rereferred to Appropriations
House 3/12/2019 3/12/2019 Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/02/2019 4/02/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
House 4/02/2019 3/23/2019 Favorable with Amendments {394062/1 Adopted 58 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/02/2019 3/23/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 58 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Higher Education - Cyber Warrior Diversity Program - Revisions
House 4/03/2019 3/25/2019 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 60 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/04/2019 3/29/2019 Referred Rules 61 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/05/2019 4/05/2019 Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2019 4/08/2019 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/08/2019 4/01/2019 Favorable Adopted 64 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2019 4/01/2019 Second Reading Passed 64 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2019 4/02/2019 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 65 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2019 4/02/2019 Returned Passed 68 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/13/2019 5/13/2019 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 455
Text - Chapter - Higher Education - Cyber Warrior Diversity Program - Revisions
(   11-1401, 11-1402, 11-1405 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM
Click to return on the top page