Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Labor and Employment - Division of Labor and Industry - Appropriations
Sponsored by
Delegate Hucker
Status
In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Governor, beginning in the fiscal year 2015 budget, to include in the annual budget bill submitted to the General Assembly an appropriation for the Division of Labor and Industry of specified minimum amounts to fund at least 10 positions for implementation of the Employment Standards Service Unit and at least 15 positions for implementation of the Prevailing Wage Unit.
Committees
Original:
Appropriations
Opposite:
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2013
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2013
Legislative Date
2/08/2013
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/27/2013
Legislative Date
2/27/2013
Action
Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2013
Legislative Date
3/13/2013
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2013
Legislative Date
3/14/2013
Action
Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/08/2013 2/08/2013 First Reading Appropriations
House 2/27/2013 2/27/2013 Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/13/2013 3/13/2013 Hearing cancelled
House 3/13/2013 3/14/2013 Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; Withdrawn
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM
Click to return on the top page