Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Real Property - Mortgages - Substitution of Surviving Spouse
Sponsored by
Delegate Malone
Status
In the House - Recommitted to Environment and Transportation (Delegate Holmes)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring a lender to substitute the name of a surviving spouse for the name of a deceased mortgagor in a mortgage if the surviving spouse is named in the deed of trust for the property but is not named in the mortgage, and submits to the lender a written request for substitution and a copy of the certificate of death of the deceased mortgagor; and requiring the lender to substitute the name of the surviving spouse in the mortgage within 30 days after receipt of a request.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2017
Legislative Date
2/10/2017
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Real Property - Mortgages - Substitution of Surviving Spouse
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/13/2017
Legislative Date
2/13/2017
Action
Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2017
Legislative Date
3/18/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2017
Legislative Date
3/15/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {270318/1
Proceedings
49 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2017
Legislative Date
3/15/2017
Action
Motion Recommit to Committee (Delegate Holmes) Adopted
Proceedings
49 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/10/2017 2/10/2017 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Real Property - Mortgages - Substitution of Surviving Spouse
House 2/13/2017 2/13/2017 Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/18/2017 3/18/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 3/18/2017 3/15/2017 Favorable with Amendments {270318/1 49 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/18/2017 3/15/2017 Motion Recommit to Committee (Delegate Holmes) Adopted 49 Click to view Recorded Media
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM
Click to return on the top page