Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Criminal Procedure - Search Warrants - Full Names
Sponsored by
Delegate Glass
Status
In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Synopsis
Requiring a specified search warrant to include the full legal name of the person to be searched.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB1284 Session: 2015 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2017
Legislative Date
2/10/2017
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2017
Legislative Date
2/10/2017
Action
Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Criminal Procedure - Search Warrants - Full Names
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/02/2017
Legislative Date
3/02/2017
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/06/2017
Action
Withdrawn by Sponsor
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/10/2017 2/10/2017 First Reading Judiciary
House 2/10/2017 2/10/2017 Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Criminal Procedure - Search Warrants - Full Names
House 3/02/2017 3/02/2017 Hearing canceled
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/06/2017 3/06/2017 Withdrawn by Sponsor
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM
Click to return on the top page