Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Maryland Transportation Authority Police
Sponsored by
Delegates Afzali, D. Barnes, Buckel, Hixson, Hornberger, Long, Luedtke, Patterson, Rose, Shoemaker, and Simonaire
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Expanding a subtraction modification under the Maryland income tax for law enforcement officers to include law enforcement officers who are members of the Maryland Transportation Authority Police and reside in a political subdivision in which the crime rate exceeds the State's crime rate; and applying the Act to all taxable years after December 31, 2017.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB1261
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2018
Legislative Date
2/09/2018
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2018
Legislative Date
2/12/2018
Action
Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2018
Legislative Date
3/13/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
47AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/15/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
49 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Referred Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
48BClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2018
Legislative Date
3/21/2018
Action
Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/09/2018 2/09/2018 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Maryland Transportation Authority Police
House 2/12/2018 2/12/2018 Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/16/2018 3/16/2018 Favorable Report by Ways and Means
House 3/17/2018 3/13/2018 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 47AClick to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Maryland Transportation Authority Police
House 3/19/2018 3/15/2018 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 49 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/19/2018 3/16/2018 Referred Budget and Taxation 48BClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/21/2018 3/21/2018 Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
(   10-207 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM
Click to return on the top page