Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Natural Resources - Aquaculture Leases and Public Shellfish Fishery Areas
Sponsored by
Delegate Adams
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the Tidal Fisheries Advisory Commission, in consultation with the Aquaculture Coordinating Council, to establish a workgroup of commercial oyster harvesters and other interested stakeholders in the State; requiring the workgroup to review commercial oyster harvest activity and oyster aquaculture production since the establishment of the public shellfish fishery areas; requiring the Commission to report the findings and recommendations of the workgroup to the Department of Natural Resources and certain committees of the General Assembly; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2018
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2018
Legislative Date
2/09/2018
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Natural Resources - Aquaculture Leases - Location
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2018
Legislative Date
2/12/2018
Action
Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2018
Legislative Date
4/07/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2018
Legislative Date
3/30/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {640513/1 Adopted
Proceedings
64 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2018
Legislative Date
3/30/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
64 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/01/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-2)
Proceedings
66 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/03/2018
Action
Referred Rules
Proceedings
65 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/09/2018 2/09/2018 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Natural Resources - Aquaculture Leases - Location
House 2/12/2018 2/12/2018 Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/07/2018 4/07/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 4/07/2018 3/30/2018 Favorable with Amendments {640513/1 Adopted 64 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/07/2018 3/30/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 64 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Natural Resources - Aquaculture Leases and Public Shellfish Fishery Areas
House 4/09/2018 4/01/2018 Third Reading Passed (137-2) 66 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/09/2018 4/03/2018 Referred Rules 65 Click to view Recorded Media
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM
Click to return on the top page