Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Institutions of Higher Education - Events Held by Conservation Organizations
Sponsored by
Delegates Mautz, Adams, Anderton, Beitzel, Carey, Hornberger, Jacobs, McComas, and Otto
Status
In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing a conservation organization to hold a specified event on the campus of a public institution of higher education notwithstanding a provision of law, regulation, or policy that prohibits the carrying or possession of a firearm on the campus of the institution; etc.
Committees
Original:
Appropriations
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0721
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2017
Legislative Date
2/10/2017
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/15/2017
Legislative Date
2/15/2017
Action
Hearing 3/02 at 3:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/06/2017
Action
Withdrawn by Sponsor
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/10/2017 2/10/2017 First Reading Appropriations
Text - First - Public Institutions of Higher Education - Events Held by Conservation Organizations
House 2/15/2017 2/15/2017 Hearing 3/02 at 3:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/06/2017 3/06/2017 Withdrawn by Sponsor
(   15-121 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM
Click to return on the top page