Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Farmers' Rights Act
Sponsored by
Delegates M. Washington, Carr, Frush, Gutierrez, Kelly, Lam, Moon, Morales, Pena-Melnyk, S. Robinson, Smith, and Tarlau
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing that specified contracts for the production of livestock impose a specified obligation of good faith on all parties; requiring specified production contracts to include a specified disclosure statement and cover sheet containing specified information; requiring specified production contracts to comply with specified standards; authorizing a specified producer to cancel a production contract within a specified period of time; providing that specified provisions in a production contract are void and unenforceable; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2016
Legislative Date
2/12/2016
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2016
Legislative Date
2/12/2016
Action
Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2016
Legislative Date
3/14/2016
Action
Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/11/2016 2/12/2016 First Reading Environment and Transportation
House 2/12/2016 2/12/2016 Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/11/2016 3/14/2016 Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
(   24-101 through 24-901 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM
Click to return on the top page