Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Healthy Vending Choices Act
Sponsored by
Delegates Glenn and Hayes
Status
In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Synopsis
Requiring that a 50% of packaged food or beverage options offered in food and beverage vending machines located on property owned or managed by the State be healthy food or beverage options; providing that any packaged food or beverage options offered in a food or beverage vending machine may not contain more than a 0.5 gram of trans fat per serving or not more than 200 milligrams of sodium per package; requiring the Department of General Services to issue a specified report on or before October 1, 2019; etc.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2017
Legislative Date
2/10/2017
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2017
Legislative Date
2/10/2017
Action
Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Maryland Healthy Vending Choices Act
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2017
Legislative Date
3/07/2017
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2017
Legislative Date
3/09/2017
Action
Withdrawn by Sponsor
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/10/2017 2/10/2017 First Reading Economic Matters
House 2/10/2017 2/10/2017 Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Maryland Healthy Vending Choices Act
House 3/07/2017 3/07/2017 Hearing canceled
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/09/2017 3/09/2017 Withdrawn by Sponsor
(   20-101 through 20-106 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM
Click to return on the top page