Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loan of 2010 - Montgomery County - Montgomery Village Martin Roy Park Pavilion
Sponsored by
Delegate Barkley
Status
In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Synopsis
Amending the Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loan of 2010 to alter the location of a grant for the pavilion in Montgomery Village; etc.
Committees
Original:
Appropriations
Opposite:
Details
Cross-filed with: SB1038
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2013
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2013
Legislative Date
3/05/2013
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2013
Legislative Date
3/05/2013
Action
Motion Rules Suspended for late introduction (Delegate Barkley) Adopted (129-3)
Proceedings
40
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2013
Legislative Date
3/05/2013
Action
Referred House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
40
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2013
Legislative Date
3/06/2013
Action
Rereferred to Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/06/2013
Legislative Date
3/06/2013
Action
Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2013
Legislative Date
3/09/2013
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2013
Legislative Date
3/14/2013
Action
Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 3/05/2013 3/05/2013 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
House 3/05/2013 3/05/2013 Motion Rules Suspended for late introduction (Delegate Barkley) Adopted (129-3) 40
House 3/05/2013 3/05/2013 Referred House Rules and Executive Nominations 40
House 3/05/2013 3/06/2013 Rereferred to Appropriations
House 3/06/2013 3/06/2013 Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/09/2013 3/09/2013 Hearing cancelled
House 3/13/2013 3/14/2013 Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; Withdrawn
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM
Click to return on the top page