Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Income Tax Refunds - Carroll County - Warrant Intercept Program
Sponsored by
Carroll County Delegation
Status
In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Analysis
Synopsis
Altering the requirement for the Comptroller to withhold Maryland income tax refunds of specified individuals with outstanding warrants to include residents of Carroll County or individuals who have outstanding warrants from Carroll County; making nonsubstantive changes to specified termination provisions; making conforming changes; etc.
Committees
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0126 Session: 2015 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016, October 1, 2018
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/17/2016
Legislative Date
2/18/2016
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/17/2016 2/18/2016 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
(   13-935, 13-936, 13-937 through 13-940 )
(   2012, 2013 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM
Click to return on the top page