Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Stadium Authority - Maryland Sports and Affiliated Foundations - Establishment
Sponsored by
Delegate Clippinger
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 575
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing the Maryland Sports office in the Maryland Stadium Authority; requiring Maryland Sports to implement a program to bring regional, national, and international sporting events to the State in order to maximize utilization of sports facilities, to enhance economic development, and to promote the State as a sporting events destination; and requiring the State Ethics Commission to review the Authority's policies on conflicts of interest and approve them, if appropriate, to govern specified officials and employees.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB1148
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/24/2017
Legislative Date
2/24/2017
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2017
Legislative Date
3/14/2017
Action
Rereferred to Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2017
Legislative Date
3/15/2017
Action
Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2017
Legislative Date
4/03/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2017
Legislative Date
3/27/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {154367/1 Adopted
Proceedings
61AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2017
Legislative Date
3/27/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
61AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2017
Legislative Date
3/28/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
62 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2017
Legislative Date
3/30/2017
Action
Referred Rules
Proceedings
59 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2017
Legislative Date
4/06/2017
Action
Rereferred to Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2017
Legislative Date
4/06/2017
Action
Hearing 4/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2017
Legislative Date
4/07/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/02/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {987675/1 Adopted
Proceedings
62 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/02/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
62 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/03/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
63AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/05/2017
Action
House Concurs Senate Amendments
Proceedings
70 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/05/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (135-0)
Proceedings
70 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/05/2017
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/25/2017
Legislative Date
5/25/2017
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 575
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/24/2017 2/24/2017 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Text - First - Maryland Stadium Authority - Maryland Sports and Affiliated Foundations - Establishment
House 3/14/2017 3/14/2017 Rereferred to Appropriations
House 3/15/2017 3/15/2017 Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/03/2017 4/03/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
House 4/03/2017 3/27/2017 Favorable with Amendments {154367/1 Adopted 61AClick to view Recorded Media
House 4/03/2017 3/27/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 61AClick to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Maryland Stadium Authority - Maryland Sports and Affiliated Foundations - Establishment
House 4/04/2017 3/28/2017 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 62 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/05/2017 3/30/2017 Referred Rules 59 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/05/2017 4/06/2017 Rereferred to Finance
Senate 4/06/2017 4/06/2017 Hearing 4/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/07/2017 4/07/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 4/10/2017 4/02/2017 Favorable with Amendments {987675/1 Adopted 62 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/10/2017 4/02/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 62 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/10/2017 4/03/2017 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 63AClick to view Recorded Media
House 4/10/2017 4/05/2017 House Concurs Senate Amendments 70 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/10/2017 4/05/2017 Third Reading Passed (135-0) 70 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/10/2017 4/05/2017 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Maryland Stadium Authority - Maryland Sports and Affiliated Foundations - Establishment
Post Passage 5/25/2017 5/25/2017 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 575
Text - Chapter - Maryland Stadium Authority - Maryland Sports and Affiliated Foundations - Establishment
(   10-604, 10-611, 10-612 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM
Click to return on the top page