Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Heritage Areas Authority - Revision of Boundaries and Boundary Maps
Sponsored by
Chair, Finance Committee (By Request - Departmental - Planning)
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 512
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the process by which the Maryland Heritage Areas Authority may amend or revise the boundaries of a recognized heritage area by allowing publication in the Maryland Register of a revised Uniform Resource Locator (URL) to a geographical information system file in addition to publication of a revised drawing or boundary description; requiring the Authority to send a copy of each boundary map for a recognized heritage area to the county clerk where the heritage area is located; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
By Request of the Governor
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
9/19/2016
Legislative Date
9/19/2016
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/11/2017
Legislative Date
1/11/2017
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/09/2017
Legislative Date
1/09/2017
Action
Hearing 1/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/16/2017
Legislative Date
1/16/2017
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/16/2017
Legislative Date
1/16/2017
Action
Hearing 1/17 at 11:00 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/19/2017
Legislative Date
1/19/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/20/2017
Legislative Date
1/20/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
8 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/24/2017
Legislative Date
1/24/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (44-0)
Proceedings
9 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/25/2017
Legislative Date
1/25/2017
Action
Referred Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
11 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/06/2017
Action
Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2017
Legislative Date
4/03/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2017
Legislative Date
3/27/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
61AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/03/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (139-0)
Proceedings
68 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/04/2017
Legislative Date
5/04/2017
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 512
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 9/19/2016 9/19/2016 Pre-filed
Senate 1/11/2017 1/11/2017 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Maryland Heritage Areas Authority - Revision of Boundaries and Boundary Maps
Senate 1/09/2017 1/09/2017 Hearing 1/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 1/16/2017 1/16/2017 Hearing canceled
Senate 1/16/2017 1/16/2017 Hearing 1/17 at 11:00 a.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 1/19/2017 1/19/2017 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 1/20/2017 1/20/2017 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 8 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Maryland Heritage Areas Authority - Revision of Boundaries and Boundary Maps
Senate 1/24/2017 1/24/2017 Third Reading Passed (44-0) 9 Click to view Recorded Media
House 1/25/2017 1/25/2017 Referred Environment and Transportation 11 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/06/2017 3/06/2017 Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/03/2017 4/03/2017 Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
House 4/03/2017 3/27/2017 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 61AClick to view Recorded Media
House 4/10/2017 4/03/2017 Third Reading Passed (139-0) 68 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/04/2017 5/04/2017 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 512
Text - Chapter - Maryland Heritage Areas Authority - Revision of Boundaries and Boundary Maps
(   13-1101, 13-1110 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM
Click to return on the top page