Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Unemployment Insurance - Eligibility for Benefits - Business Operation Closings
Sponsored by
Chair, Finance Committee (By Request - Departmental - Labor, Licensing and Regulation)
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 249
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing the Secretary of Labor, Licensing and Regulation to exempt employees of an employer that closes its business operation or part of its business operation for a definite period not exceeding 10 weeks for inventory, vacation, or another purpose from the requirement to actively seek work during that period to be eligible to receive unemployment insurance benefits; and providing that a specified exemption may be granted only with respect to a specific business operation closing.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0141
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
By Request of the Governor
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
9/29/2016
Legislative Date
9/29/2016
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/11/2017
Legislative Date
1/11/2017
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/18/2017
Legislative Date
1/18/2017
Action
Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/23/2017
Legislative Date
2/23/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/24/2017
Legislative Date
2/24/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
31 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/28/2017
Legislative Date
2/28/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
33 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/01/2017
Legislative Date
3/01/2017
Action
Referred Economic Matters
Proceedings
36 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2017
Legislative Date
3/27/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2017
Legislative Date
3/22/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
56 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2017
Legislative Date
3/23/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (139-0)
Proceedings
57 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2017
Legislative Date
3/25/2017
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
54 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/18/2017
Legislative Date
4/18/2017
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 249
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 9/29/2016 9/29/2016 Pre-filed
Senate 1/11/2017 1/11/2017 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Unemployment Insurance - Eligibility for Benefits - Business Operation Closings
Senate 1/18/2017 1/18/2017 Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/23/2017 2/23/2017 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 2/24/2017 2/24/2017 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 31 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Unemployment Insurance - Eligibility for Benefits - Business Operation Closings
Senate 2/28/2017 2/28/2017 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 33 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/01/2017 3/01/2017 Referred Economic Matters 36 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/27/2017 3/27/2017 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 3/27/2017 3/22/2017 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 56 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/28/2017 3/23/2017 Third Reading Passed (139-0) 57 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/29/2017 3/25/2017 Returned Passed 54 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 4/18/2017 4/18/2017 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 249
Text - Chapter - Unemployment Insurance - Eligibility for Benefits - Business Operation Closings
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM
Click to return on the top page