Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Grants and Contracts - Reimbursement of Nonprofit Indirect Costs - Application
Sponsored by
Senator Kagan
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 641
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Applying a certain provision of law related to the reimbursement of indirect costs incurred by certain nonprofit organizations to certain grants and contracts; and providing that a certain provision of law does not require the reimbursement of indirect costs incurred under certain grants and contracts during any fiscal year that began before July 1, 2019.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0365
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2019
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
10/18/2018
Legislative Date
10/18/2018
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/09/2019
Legislative Date
1/09/2019
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/18/2019
Legislative Date
1/18/2019
Action
Hearing 1/29 at 3:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/11/2019
Legislative Date
2/11/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/12/2019
Legislative Date
2/12/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {264137/1 Adopted
Proceedings
24 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/12/2019
Legislative Date
2/12/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
24 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/14/2019
Legislative Date
2/14/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (43-0)
Proceedings
26 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/15/2019
Legislative Date
2/15/2019
Action
Referred Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
28 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2019
Legislative Date
3/12/2019
Action
Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2019
Legislative Date
3/21/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/22/2019
Legislative Date
3/17/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {536280/1 Adopted
Proceedings
52 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/22/2019
Legislative Date
3/17/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
52 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/25/2019
Legislative Date
3/18/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (130-0)
Proceedings
53 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2019
Legislative Date
3/27/2019
Action
Senate Concurs House Amendments
Proceedings
59 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2019
Legislative Date
3/27/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
59 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2019
Legislative Date
3/27/2019
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/25/2019
Legislative Date
5/25/2019
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 641
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 10/18/2018 10/18/2018 Pre-filed
Senate 1/09/2019 1/09/2019 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - State Grants and Contracts - Reimbursement of Nonprofit Indirect Costs - Application
Senate 1/18/2019 1/18/2019 Hearing 1/29 at 3:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/11/2019 2/11/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/12/2019 2/12/2019 Favorable with Amendments {264137/1 Adopted 24 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/12/2019 2/12/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 24 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - State Grants and Contracts - Reimbursement of Nonprofit Indirect Costs - Application
Senate 2/14/2019 2/14/2019 Third Reading Passed (43-0) 26 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/15/2019 2/15/2019 Referred Health and Government Operations 28 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/12/2019 3/12/2019 Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/21/2019 3/21/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/22/2019 3/17/2019 Favorable with Amendments {536280/1 Adopted 52 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/22/2019 3/17/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 52 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/25/2019 3/18/2019 Third Reading Passed (130-0) 53 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/02/2019 3/27/2019 Senate Concurs House Amendments 59 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/02/2019 3/27/2019 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 59 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/02/2019 3/27/2019 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - State Grants and Contracts - Reimbursement of Nonprofit Indirect Costs - Application
Post Passage 5/25/2019 5/25/2019 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 641
Text - Chapter - State Grants and Contracts - Reimbursement of Nonprofit Indirect Costs - Application
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM
Click to return on the top page