Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Insurance - Surplus Lines Insurers, Surplus Lines Brokers, and Reinsurers
Sponsored by
Chair, Finance Committee (By Request - Departmental - Maryland Insurance Administration)
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 37
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the requirements an insurer must meet to be approved as a surplus lines insurer by the Maryland Insurance Commissioner; providing for the expiration of a surplus lines insurer's approval; establishing a process for renewal of a surplus lines insurer's approval; clarifying that a requirement to report specified business subject to tax and pay the tax stated in the report at specified intervals applies only to surplus lines brokers that have transacted surplus lines business in the State during the reporting period; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
By Request of the Governor
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
9/27/2016
Legislative Date
9/27/2016
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/11/2017
Legislative Date
1/11/2017
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/05/2017
Legislative Date
1/05/2017
Action
Hearing 1/12 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/13/2017
Legislative Date
1/13/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/13/2017
Legislative Date
1/13/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
3 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/17/2017
Legislative Date
1/17/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
5 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/17/2017
Legislative Date
1/17/2017
Action
Referred Economic Matters
Proceedings
5 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/22/2017
Legislative Date
2/22/2017
Action
Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2017
Legislative Date
3/17/2017
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2017
Legislative Date
3/17/2017
Action
Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2017
Legislative Date
4/05/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2017
Legislative Date
3/29/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
63 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/30/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (140-0)
Proceedings
64 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2017
Legislative Date
4/01/2017
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
61 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/11/2017
Legislative Date
4/11/2017
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 37
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 9/27/2016 9/27/2016 Pre-filed
Senate 1/11/2017 1/11/2017 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Insurance - Surplus Lines Insurers, Surplus Lines Brokers, and Reinsurers
Senate 1/05/2017 1/05/2017 Hearing 1/12 at 1:30 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 1/13/2017 1/13/2017 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 1/13/2017 1/13/2017 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 3 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Insurance - Surplus Lines Insurers, Surplus Lines Brokers, and Reinsurers
Senate 1/17/2017 1/17/2017 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 5 Click to view Recorded Media
House 1/17/2017 1/17/2017 Referred Economic Matters 5 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/22/2017 2/22/2017 Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/17/2017 3/17/2017 Hearing canceled
House 3/17/2017 3/17/2017 Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/05/2017 4/05/2017 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 4/05/2017 3/29/2017 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 63 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/06/2017 3/30/2017 Third Reading Passed (140-0) 64 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/07/2017 4/01/2017 Returned Passed 61 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 4/11/2017 4/11/2017 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 37
Text - Chapter - Insurance - Surplus Lines Insurers, Surplus Lines Brokers, and Reinsurers
(   2-112, 3-318, 3-325 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM
Click to return on the top page