Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Lottery Tickets - Prohibited Acts - Delivery Service
Sponsored by
Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee (By Request - Departmental - Lottery and Gaming Control Agency)
Status
In the Senate - Recommitted to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs (Senator Conway)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting a person or governmental unit from selling or purchasing a State lottery ticket on behalf of specified individuals and delivering or transmitting the ticket or an electronic image of the ticket to an individual as a for-profit business delivery service; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
By Request of the Governor
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
10/07/2016
Legislative Date
10/07/2016
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/11/2017
Legislative Date
1/11/2017
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - State Lottery Tickets - Prohibited Acts - Delivery Service
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/04/2017
Legislative Date
1/04/2017
Action
Hearing 1/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/13/2017
Legislative Date
1/13/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/13/2017
Legislative Date
1/13/2017
Action
Favorable
Proceedings
3 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/13/2017
Legislative Date
1/13/2017
Action
Motion Special Order until 1/17 (Senator Brochin) Rejected (20-24)
Proceedings
3 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/13/2017
Legislative Date
1/13/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted (31-13)
Proceedings
3 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/13/2017
Legislative Date
1/13/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
3 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - State Lottery Tickets - Prohibited Acts - Delivery Service
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/17/2017
Legislative Date
1/17/2017
Action
Motion Returned Second Reading (Senator Conway) Adopted
Proceedings
5 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/17/2017
Legislative Date
1/17/2017
Action
Motion Special Order until 1/19 (Senator Jennings) Adopted
Proceedings
5 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/19/2017
Legislative Date
1/19/2017
Action
Motion Recommit to Committee (Senator Conway) Adopted
Proceedings
7 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 10/07/2016 10/07/2016 Pre-filed
Senate 1/11/2017 1/11/2017 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - State Lottery Tickets - Prohibited Acts - Delivery Service
Senate 1/04/2017 1/04/2017 Hearing 1/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 1/13/2017 1/13/2017 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 1/13/2017 1/13/2017 Favorable 3 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 1/13/2017 1/13/2017 Motion Special Order until 1/17 (Senator Brochin) Rejected (20-24) 3 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 1/13/2017 1/13/2017 Favorable Adopted (31-13) 3 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 1/13/2017 1/13/2017 Second Reading Passed 3 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - State Lottery Tickets - Prohibited Acts - Delivery Service
Senate 1/17/2017 1/17/2017 Motion Returned Second Reading (Senator Conway) Adopted 5 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 1/17/2017 1/17/2017 Motion Special Order until 1/19 (Senator Jennings) Adopted 5 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 1/19/2017 1/19/2017 Motion Recommit to Committee (Senator Conway) Adopted 7 Click to view Recorded Media
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM
Click to return on the top page