Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Department of Commerce - Maryland Economic Development Assistance Authority and Fund - Renaming and Revising
Sponsored by
Chair, Finance Committee (By Request - Departmental - Commerce)
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Renaming the Maryland Economic Development Assistance Authority and the Maryland Economic Development Assistance Fund to be the Advantage Maryland Fund Authority and the Advantage Maryland Fund; expanding the information required as part of a report on the economic benefits of financial assistance provided under law to include the number, type, use, amount, and terms of the financial assistance provided; providing that financial assistance from the fund used to finance costs incurred for working capital may not exceed $3,000,000; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018
By Request of the Governor
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
10/13/2017
Legislative Date
10/13/2017
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/10/2018
Legislative Date
1/10/2018
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/03/2018
Legislative Date
1/03/2018
Action
Hearing 1/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/22/2018
Legislative Date
1/22/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/23/2018
Legislative Date
1/23/2018
Action
Favorable
Proceedings
10 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/23/2018
Legislative Date
1/23/2018
Action
Motion Special Order until 1/24 (Senator Madaleno) Adopted
Proceedings
10 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/24/2018
Legislative Date
1/24/2018
Action
Favorable
Proceedings
11 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/24/2018
Legislative Date
1/24/2018
Action
Motion Special Order until 1/25 (Senator Middleton) Adopted
Proceedings
11 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/25/2018
Legislative Date
1/25/2018
Action
Favorable
Proceedings
12 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/25/2018
Legislative Date
1/25/2018
Action
Motion Special Order until 1/30 (Senator Astle) Adopted
Proceedings
12 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/30/2018
Legislative Date
1/30/2018
Action
Favorable
Proceedings
15 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/30/2018
Legislative Date
1/30/2018
Action
Motion Recommit to Committee (Senator Middleton) Finance Adopted
Proceedings
15 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/12/2018
Legislative Date
2/12/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/14/2018
Legislative Date
2/14/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {777874/1 Adopted
Proceedings
26 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/14/2018
Legislative Date
2/14/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
26 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/16/2018
Legislative Date
2/16/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
28 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/19/2018
Legislative Date
2/19/2018
Action
Referred Economic Matters
Proceedings
29 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2018
Legislative Date
3/07/2018
Action
Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/09/2018
Action
Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 10/13/2017 10/13/2017 Pre-filed
Senate 1/10/2018 1/10/2018 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Department of Commerce - Maryland Economic Development Assistance Authority and Fund - Renaming and Revising
Senate 1/03/2018 1/03/2018 Hearing 1/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 1/22/2018 1/22/2018 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 1/23/2018 1/23/2018 Favorable 10 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 1/23/2018 1/23/2018 Motion Special Order until 1/24 (Senator Madaleno) Adopted 10 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 1/24/2018 1/24/2018 Favorable 11 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 1/24/2018 1/24/2018 Motion Special Order until 1/25 (Senator Middleton) Adopted 11 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 1/25/2018 1/25/2018 Favorable 12 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 1/25/2018 1/25/2018 Motion Special Order until 1/30 (Senator Astle) Adopted 12 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 1/30/2018 1/30/2018 Favorable 15 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 1/30/2018 1/30/2018 Motion Recommit to Committee (Senator Middleton) Finance Adopted 15 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/12/2018 2/12/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 2/14/2018 2/14/2018 Favorable with Amendments {777874/1 Adopted 26 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/14/2018 2/14/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 26 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Department of Commerce - Maryland Economic Development Assistance Authority and Fund - Renaming and Revising
Senate 2/16/2018 2/16/2018 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 28 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/19/2018 2/19/2018 Referred Economic Matters 29 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/07/2018 3/07/2018 Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/09/2018 4/09/2018 Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
(   10-104, 11-302, 5-102, 5-301, 5-305, 5-310, 5-313, 5-315, 5-316, 5-322, 5-324, 5-325, 5-401, 5-408 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM
Click to return on the top page