Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Criminal Law - Veterans - Medical Cannabis
Sponsored by
Senator Young
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Adding posttraumatic stress disorder to the definition of "debilitating medical condition" for the purposes of specified affirmative defenses to a charge of use or possession of marijuana; establishing a specified affirmative defense for a charge of use or possession of marijuana for a specified qualified veteran patient; establishing a specified written certification for a qualified veteran patient; etc.
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0902 Session: 2016 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
10/19/2016
Legislative Date
10/19/2016
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/11/2017
Legislative Date
1/11/2017
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Criminal Law - Veterans - Medical Cannabis
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/17/2017
Legislative Date
1/17/2017
Action
Hearing 1/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2017
Legislative Date
2/06/2017
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 10/19/2016 10/19/2016 Pre-filed
Senate 1/11/2017 1/11/2017 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Criminal Law - Veterans - Medical Cannabis
Senate 1/17/2017 1/17/2017 Hearing 1/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/06/2017 2/06/2017 Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
(   5-601 )
(   13-3401 through 13-3405 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM
Click to return on the top page