Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Animal Abuse Registry
Sponsored by
Senator Mathias
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Department of Public Safety and Correctional Services to establish the Maryland Animal Abuse Registry; requiring the Registry to be updated in a specified manner and to include specified information; requiring a person convicted of crimes involving animal cruelty to register with the county sheriff within 10 days of conviction for a period of 5 years from the date of judgment or the date of release from incarceration, whichever is later; requiring a registrant to update specified information for registration; etc.
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0912 Session: 2014 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
11/02/2016
Legislative Date
11/02/2016
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/11/2017
Legislative Date
1/11/2017
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Maryland Animal Abuse Registry
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/04/2017
Legislative Date
1/04/2017
Action
Hearing 1/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/30/2017
Legislative Date
1/30/2017
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 11/02/2016 11/02/2016 Pre-filed
Senate 1/11/2017 1/11/2017 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Maryland Animal Abuse Registry
Senate 1/04/2017 1/04/2017 Hearing 1/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 1/30/2017 1/30/2017 Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
(   11-1101 through 11-1111 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM
Click to return on the top page