Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Health Insurance – Utilization Review – Private Review Agents
Sponsored by
Senator Augustine
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring that certain criteria and standards used by private review agents for health insurance utilization review relating to mental health and substance use disorder benefits meet certain requirements; requiring a private review agent to take certain actions before issuing an adverse decision; and specifying the procedure for private review agents to follow when making decisions related to mental health and substance use disorder benefits.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0110
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): January 1, 2025
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
10/27/2023
Legislative Date
10/27/2023
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/10/2024
Legislative Date
1/10/2024
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Health Insurance – Utilization Review – Private Review Agents
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/02/2024
Legislative Date
2/02/2024
Action
Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 10/27/2023 10/27/2023 Pre-filed
Senate 1/10/2024 1/10/2024 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Health Insurance – Utilization Review – Private Review Agents
Senate 2/02/2024 2/02/2024 Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Last Updated: 2/21/2024 5:07 PM
Click to return on the top page