Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Higher Education - Heroin and Opioid Addiction and Prevention Policies - Exceptions and Revisions
Sponsored by
Senators Conway and Miller
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 414
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Exempting the University of Maryland, University College, the University of Maryland Center for Environmental Science, and an off-campus nonresidential location of an institution of higher education from the requirement to establish a policy that addresses heroin and opioid addiction and prevention that includes storing naloxone and training campus police or other designated personnel on how to recognize the symptoms of an opioid overdose; requiring these institutions to provide all students with certain resources; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2018
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/12/2018
Legislative Date
1/12/2018
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/17/2018
Legislative Date
1/17/2018
Action
Hearing 1/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2018
Legislative Date
2/05/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2018
Legislative Date
2/06/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {884535/1 Adopted
Proceedings
20 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2018
Legislative Date
2/06/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
20 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/08/2018
Legislative Date
2/08/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
22 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2018
Legislative Date
2/09/2018
Action
Referred Appropriations
Proceedings
23 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/28/2018
Legislative Date
2/28/2018
Action
Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/19/2018
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/19/2018
Action
Hearing 3/20 at 1:15 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2018
Legislative Date
4/03/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2018
Legislative Date
3/25/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
59 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2018
Legislative Date
3/26/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
60 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/31/2018
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
62 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/08/2018
Legislative Date
5/08/2018
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 414
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/12/2018 1/12/2018 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - Higher Education - Heroin and Opioid Addiction and Prevention Policies - Exceptions and Revisions
Senate 1/17/2018 1/17/2018 Hearing 1/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/05/2018 2/05/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/06/2018 2/06/2018 Favorable with Amendments {884535/1 Adopted 20 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/06/2018 2/06/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 20 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Higher Education - Heroin and Opioid Addiction and Prevention Policies - Exceptions and Revisions
Senate 2/08/2018 2/08/2018 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 22 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/09/2018 2/09/2018 Referred Appropriations 23 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/28/2018 2/28/2018 Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/19/2018 3/19/2018 Hearing canceled
House 3/19/2018 3/19/2018 Hearing 3/20 at 1:15 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/03/2018 4/03/2018 Favorable Report by Appropriations
House 4/03/2018 3/25/2018 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 59 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/04/2018 3/26/2018 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 60 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/05/2018 3/31/2018 Returned Passed 62 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/08/2018 5/08/2018 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 414
Text - Chapter - Higher Education - Heroin and Opioid Addiction and Prevention Policies - Exceptions and Revisions
(   11-1201, 11-1202, 11-1203 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM
Click to return on the top page